COVENT GARDEN AREA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Covent Garden Area Trust is a charity set up on the abolition of the Greater London Council. Its objects include the conservation of the Covent Garden Area, its architectural character, its buildings and features of historical or architectural interest. By virtue of its 150 year lease, it exercises powers over changes of use and alterations to key buildings known as "the Protected Lands".
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Camden
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 04 August 1988: Standard registration
- C G A T (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Robert Campbell | Trustee | 28 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Ella LEWIS-COLLINS | Trustee | 31 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Peter James Scutt | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Terence Alban Sharrott | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jeannine Saba | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anoma Radkevitch | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stewart Carroll | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Faye Watson Davies | Trustee | 07 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Francis Patrick Monahan | Trustee | 26 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Mason | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Mark Shearer | Trustee | 12 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Velluet | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Ann Bax | Trustee | 08 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA LOUISE CHAMBERS | Trustee | 07 July 2009 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £134.25k | £122.71k | £143.89k | £152.59k | £177.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.87k | £55.72k | £87.43k | £103.95k | £129.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/07/1988 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/07/1994 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/11/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/12/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/12/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/12/2012 as amended on 27 Nov 2018 as amended on 07 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
(1) TO ACQUIRE FROM THE LONDON RESIDUARY BODY A FREEHOLD OR LEASEHOLD INTEREST OR INTERESTS IN CERTAIN PROPERTIES SITUATED IN THE AREA OF CENTRAL LONDON BOUNDED BY KINGSWAY, ALDWYCH, HIGH HOLBORN, SHAFTESBURY AVENUE, CHARING CROSS ROAD AND THE STRAND FOR THE PURPOSE OF CARE, CONSERVATION, MAINTENANCE, PROTECTION AND ENHANCEMENT OF THE PROPERTIES. (2) THE CONSERVATION OF TH COVENT GARDEN AREA AND ITS ARCHITECTURAL CHARACTER, ITS BUILDINGS AND FEATURES OF HISTORICAL OR ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF ITS SPECIAL QUALITIES IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST INCLUDING THE PRESERVATION OF THE MIX OF RESIDENTIAL, BUSINESS AND OTHER USES WHICH CHARACTERISES THE AREA. FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 3 OF MEMORANDUM.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Covent Garden Area Trust
2nd floor 20 Bedford Street
Covent Garden
LONDON
WC2E 9HP
- Phone:
- 02072409418
- Email:
- admin@cgareatrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window