Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF 3, COLHAM ROAD

Charity number: 299892
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2005 03 November 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2005 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2004 Not submitted