Havencare Homes and Support Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Havencare provides homes and support to people with learning disabilities, autistic people, and people with other cognitive differences including acquired brain injuries. Services include bespoke housing, supported living, extra-care, and enabling. Havencare's services are regulated by the Care Quality Commission.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£8,496,939
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £8.48m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £11.09k | |
Other | £5.78k |
Total expenditure:
£8,423,977
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £8.42m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £8,004,740 from 98 government contract(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £8.42m | |
Retained for future use | £72.96k |
People

268 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Plymouth City
- Torbay
Governance
- 09 September 1988: Standard registration
- 12 December 2022: Funds received from 1076727 BROOK HOUSING LIMITED
- HAVENCARE (PLYMOUTH) (Previous name)
- HAVENCARE (SOUTH WEST) LIMITED (Previous name)
- HAVENCARE PLYMOUTH LTD (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen John Reynolds | Chair |
|
||||||
Deborah Clinton | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
KAY O' SHAUGHNESSY | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|||||
NICHOLAS JOHN HOLMAN | Trustee | 09 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Caroline Cassidy | Trustee | 23 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Neil Moorman | Trustee | 25 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Kathleen Cuthbert | Trustee | 07 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.72m | £6.97m | £7.42m | £7.92m | £8.50m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.52m | £6.61m | £7.30m | £7.96m | £8.42m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.69m | £6.71m | £7.05m | £7.90m | £8.00m | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £230.33k | £370.36k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £5.69m | £6.71m | £7.05m | £7.90m | £8.48m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.11k | £449 | £62 | £1.97k | £11.09k | |
|
Income - Other | £26.56k | £254.82k | £370.36k | £20.16k | £5.78k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.52m | £6.61m | £7.30m | £7.96m | £8.42m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £44.51k | £10.50k | £13.05k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £123.56k | £3.48m | £3.34m | £3.37m | £3.73m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.42m | £1.74m | £2.00m | £2.35m | £2.11m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £486.42k | £681.18k | £681.35k | £1.10m | £1.14m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/11/1987 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/11/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/07/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/12/2001 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/05/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15 DEC 2016 as amended on 16 May 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO BENEFIT THE PUBLIC BY THE PROVISION OF RELIEF TO THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF ANY FORM OF DISABILITY PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY LEARNING, SENSORY DISABILITY OR MENTAL ILLNESS, THIS RELIEF BEING PROVIDED BY ALL FORMS OF SUPPORT TO ENABLE THEM TO LIVE THE LIVES THEY CHOOSE AND IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORT IN THE HOME, BY SUPPORT IN THE COMMUNITY AND THE WORK PLACE, AND BY THE PROVISION OF RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE PERSONS LIVING WITHIN THE SOUTH WEST OF ENGLAND. [NOTHING IN THE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.]
Contact information
- Address:
-
Havencare Homes and Support Limited
10-12 Union Street
PLYMOUTH
PL1 2SR
- Phone:
- 01752251476
- Email:
- Reception@havencare.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window