LIBERTAS CHARITIES GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 August 1988: Standard registration
- 16 October 2007: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £67 | £11.61k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.72k | £11.18k | £80 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 31 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 31 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 21 March 2005 | 49 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 25 April 2005 | 84 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11TH AUGUST 1988, AMENDED OCT 2000
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED OR DISABLED AND THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF MENTAL AND PHYSICAL DISORDERS AND DEFECTS AND DISABILITIES. (II) TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF THE AGED AND OF YOUNG CHILDREN IN NEED. (III) TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF THE DEAF, AND PARTIALLY DEAF, THE BLIND AND THE PARTIALLY BLIND. (IV) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OF PERSONS WHO HAVE BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT HAVE SPECIAL NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window