Accounts and annual returns THE CAROLINE HOUSE SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 299912
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 29 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 29 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 18 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 18 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 19 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 19 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 15 September 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 Not Required