Financial history THE CAROLINE HOUSE SUPPORT GROUP

Charity number: 299912
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008
Total gross income £12.36k £6.15k £15.80k £7.07k £11.87k
Total expenditure £13.62k £2.87k £10.98k £11.30k £9.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A