THE CAROLINE HOUSE SUPPORT GROUP
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relieving patients and former patients and their families of Caroline House who are sick, convalescent, disabled, handicapped, infirm or in need of financial or other assistance and generally supporting the work of the unit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
Governance
- 15 August 1988: Standard registration
- 29 January 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 29 January 2010: Funds transferred to 1051173 NORFOLK COMMUNITY HEALTH AND CARE NHS TRUST CHARIT...
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.36k | £6.15k | £15.80k | £7.07k | £11.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.62k | £2.87k | £10.98k | £11.30k | £9.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 29 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 29 January 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 18 January 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 18 January 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 19 January 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 19 January 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 15 September 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14TH JULY 1988 AS AMENDED ON 23RD JUNE 1998 AS AMENDED NOVEMBER 2007
Charitable objects
A) TO RELIEVE SERVICE USERS AND FORMER SERVICE USERS AND THEIR FAMILIES OF CAROLINE HOUSE WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, HAVE DISABILITIES OR IMPAIRMENT, OR ARE INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER ASSISTANCE AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE UNIT. B) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE STAFF OF CAROLINE HOUSE. C) TO UNDERTAKE ALL FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS, PURPOSES ORGANISATIONS OR BODIES AS THE SUPPORT GROUP MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window