Holyrood Academy PTFA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Limited activities - raises money via gift aid donations from parents and friends of the school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Somerset
Governance
- 18 August 1988: Standard registration
- THE HOLYROOD SCHOOL CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucie Hopkins | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Giles | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
TINA COLES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £6.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12TH JULY 1988 SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 4 JUNE 1998 as amended on 12 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME THEREOF IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE STUDENTS OF THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLYROOD COMMUNITY SCHOOL
ZEMBARD LANE
CHARD
TA20 1JL
- Phone:
- 01460260100
- Email:
- tcoles@educ.somerset.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window