Accounts and annual returns THE MID SUSSEX HOMEOPATHIC GROUP

Charity Number: 299924
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2013 19 February 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2012 19 February 2014 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 25 February 2013 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required