Financial history WYCOMBE WOMEN'S AID LIMITED

Charity number: 299946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £613.03k £745.41k £599.67k £651.61k £684.24k
Total expenditure £646.32k £636.47k £648.00k £633.69k £695.53k
Income from government contracts £24.96k £24.96k £24.96k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £84.00k £84.00k £84.00k £84.00k £84.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £184.94k £228.38k £125.80k £197.97k £135.99k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £427.69k £516.76k £473.79k £452.88k £545.61k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £398 £269 £86 £763 £2.64k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £646.32k £636.47k £648.00k £633.69k £695.53k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £4.32k £5.74k £6.12k £5.49k £6.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0