THE WOODWARD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant making
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- United States
Governance
- 09 September 1988: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATHERINE MATILDA ROSE WOODWARD | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Mary Victoria Woodward | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Hunniwood | Trustee | 18 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Camilla Davan Woodward | Trustee | 26 July 1988 |
|
|||||
SHAUN ANTHONY WOODWARD Rt Hon | Trustee | 26 July 1988 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £169.68k | £158.57k | £107.17k | £133.56k | £202.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £356.32k | £386.47k | £413.67k | £430.69k | £402.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 26TH JULY 1988
Charitable objects
TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIMES AND IN SUCH PROPORTION AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Sainsbury Family Charitable Tru
THE PEAK
5 Wilton Road
LONDON
SW1V 1AP
- Phone:
- 02074100330
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window