VIOLET CHAPMAN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
See classification section
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Devon
Governance
- 17 September 1988: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Penny Browning | Trustee | 26 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Brocklesby | Trustee | 12 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Judy Henrietta Barton | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN JOHN WALKER | Trustee | 03 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
SHIRLEY ANN WYATT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.64k | £4.53k | £3.55k | £4.02k | £4.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.78k | £5.38k | £3.91k | £4.84k | £4.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 27TH OCTOBER 1986 AS AMENDED ON 12 MAY 2006 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE PHYSICAL OR MENTAL HEALTH OF THE RESIDENTS OF HEMYOCK AND THE SURROUNDING SEE GOVERNING DOCUMENT FOR FULL DETAILS.
Area of benefit
HEMYOCK AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 ST. QUINTIN PARK
BATHPOOL
TAUNTON
TA2 8TB
- Phone:
- 01823232311
- Email:
- s.walker@ashfords.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window