BEDFORD UNIT NO 29 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We help young people to become responsible adults through sport, teamwork and individual problem solving using a nautical theme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 04 July 1972: Standard registration
- TS VICTORIUS (Working name)
- BEDFORD SEA CADET CORPS UNIT NO 29 (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beverley Anderson | Chair | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Robinson Mrs | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Anthony Steggall | Trustee | 06 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Anne Warboys | Trustee | 09 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
PERCY NEWTON | Trustee | 08 January 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.44k | £33.18k | £32.46k | £18.39k | £15.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.32k | £15.03k | £18.93k | £15.70k | £13.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.10k | £11.96k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 March 2023 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 March 2023 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 August 2022 | 190 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 August 2022 | 190 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 July 2021 | 173 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEA CADET REGULATIONS
Charitable objects
The charitable purpose of the Unit (the Purpose) is to promote the development of young people in achieving their physical, intellectual and social potential as individuals and as responsible citizens by the provision of education and leisure time activities using a nautical theme and in accordance with the principles, ethos and practices of the Marine Society & Sea Cadets (MSSC).
Area of benefit
BEDFORD DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 SEVERN WAY
BEDFORD
MK41 7BY
- Phone:
- 07720541958
- Email:
- percynewton@tiscali.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window