Financial history BIDDENHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 300004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £22.14k £29.51k £18.47k £19.65k £19.85k
Total expenditure £12.88k £9.41k £13.47k £18.92k £50.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £11.37k £19.49k £114 N/A N/A