Trustees BIDDENHAM VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 300004

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHIL INNESS | Chair | 01 September 2006 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD CHARLES O'QUINN | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Houghton | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Hurford | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN ESAM | Trustee | 08 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Julia Johnson | Trustee | 08 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
OBED MARTIN HOSEGOOD | Trustee | 19 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WATSON | Trustee | 01 May 2002 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH ANNE WATSON | Trustee | 01 November 1995 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EDWARD GREENGRASS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.