Financial history CARLTON AND CHELLINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 300014
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £6.02k £6.09k £21.81k £9.95k £10.81k
Total expenditure £2.97k £3.09k £2.64k £7.36k £21.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £19.30k N/A N/A