DUNTON RECREATION GROUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides sports facilities and playarea for various age groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 19 June 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 28 November 1968: Standard registration
- DUNTON RECREATION ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Hall | Trustee | 25 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Dawson | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN SPRING | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
HEIDI MALLARD-McHUGH | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Glynis Keech | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALAN DANSEY | Trustee | 28 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
EILEEN BONE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 19/06/2019 | 19/06/2020 | 19/06/2021 | 19/06/2022 | 19/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.20k | £10.05k | £2.05k | £9.19k | £12.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.39k | £5.42k | £2.60k | £5.63k | £10.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days | |
Annual return | 19 June 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 June 2022 | 05 June 2023 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 June 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 19 June 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 15H OCTOBER 1968
Charitable objects
RECREATION GROUND.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF DUNTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Horseshoe Close
Dunton
BIGGLESWADE
SG18 8RY
- Phone:
- 01767601857
- Email:
- heidi-herbert@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window