HARROLD PLAYING FIELD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of sporting, recreation and leisure facilities mainly for the residents of Harrold and the surrounding villages
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bedford
Governance
- 25 June 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Davis | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Johnathan Calver | Trustee | 03 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nick Aellen | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barry John Wilson | Trustee | 07 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.83k | £67.65k | £33.35k | £56.43k | £62.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.14k | £19.96k | £39.11k | £54.51k | £60.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £43.89k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 12 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 18 February 2023 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 17 April 2023 | 261 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 04 September 2021 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 10TH MAY 1963
Charitable objects
RECREATION GROUND
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HARROLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Peters Barn
High Street
Harrold
BEDFORD
MK43 7DQ
- Phone:
- 07500591633
- Email:
- Nick.aellen@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window