HEATH AND REACH VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manage the Village Hall, including operating a website and online booking system, maintaining the structure and interior of the hall, and raising monies via special events to supplement the income from hiring out the Hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 21 August 1961: Standard registration
- HEATH VILAGE BARN (Working name)
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- VILLAGE HALL HEATH BARN (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Strofton | Chair | 20 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Fowler | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy William Vass | Trustee | 15 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Vass | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Williams | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
ERICA STROFTON | Trustee | 20 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.55k | £14.89k | £15.25k | £24.01k | £18.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.64k | £10.65k | £5.76k | £18.48k | £12.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £8.00k | £4.73k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE OF THE 9TH DECEMBER 1937
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HEATH AND REACH.
Area of benefit
HEATH AND REACH
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 Lanes End
Heath and Reach
Leighton Buzzard
LU7 0AE
- Phone:
- 01525237045
- Email:
- info@heathvillagebarn.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window