Financial history RENHOLD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 300059
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.43k £23.83k £26.14k £20.65k £24.07k
Total expenditure £28.47k £13.59k £15.67k £20.06k £26.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.73k £11.96k N/A N/A