ROXTON PARISH HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Village Hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 18 December 1961: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH MUDD | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sheila Janet Bradley | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Elizabeth Chandler | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALISTAIR LAW | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|||||
Mary Pike | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL GALE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.70k | £17.06k | £20.43k | £8.39k | £20.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.75k | £6.06k | £3.30k | £8.64k | £26.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £19.39k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 July 2023 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 08 June 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10 AUGUST, 1951
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ROXTON AND IT IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 PARK ROAD
ROXTON
BEDFORD
MK44 3ER
- Phone:
- 01234 870160
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window