Financial history SHEFFORD TOWN MEMORIAL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 300064
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £148.22k £91.42k £118.24k £162.55k £180.73k
Total expenditure £162.66k £88.98k £103.07k £159.39k £188.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £31.95k £31.09k £500 N/A