WESTONING VILLAGE HALL (SPENSLEY TRUST)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Running village hall, offering facilities for community activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 01 August 1961: Standard registration
- WESTONING VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- SPENSLEY FOR PARISH ROOM (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JILL ELLIS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Joyce Nethersole | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Corless | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA CAIRD | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Pestell | Trustee | 19 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Crofts | Trustee | 01 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER VALENTINE | Trustee | 02 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE LUFF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH EGLINTON-WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAT CROWE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.66k | £24.13k | £14.88k | £19.28k | £21.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.37k | £7.14k | £11.46k | £12.60k | £14.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.24k | £12.73k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 24TH MAY 1940 SCHEME SEALED 27TH JULY 1978
Charitable objects
THE PROVISIO AND MAINTENANCE OF A PARISH ROOM FOR THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL, MORAL AND INTELLECTUAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF READING AND RECREATION ROOMS, LIBRARY, CLASSE, RECRETIONS AND ENTERTAINMENTS OR OTHERWISE AS MAY BE FOUND EXPEDIENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WESTONING,
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WESTONING
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Newlands Road
Westoning
Bedford
MK45 5LD
- Phone:
- 01525753776
- Email:
- jan.crofts1@ntlworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window