Financial history WILSTEAD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 300083
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £16.55k £25.34k £29.69k £15.55k £24.29k
Total expenditure £21.24k £13.48k £14.57k £38.64k £24.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.10k £18.62k N/A £4.05k