WOBURN LIDO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To manage and operate the Lido and open air swimming pool known as Woburn Lido. Open all year for the benefit, health and well being of the residents of Woburn and surrounding areas with May to September Summer Season having full pool heating, and the remainder of the year for adult only Cold Water Swimming,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 06 August 1964: Standard registration
- 09 August 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 October 2012: Re-registered
- WOBURN SWIMMING POOL (Working name)
- SWIMMING POOL FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Smith | Trustee | 01 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Jones | Trustee | 08 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Murray Guy Henning | Trustee | 05 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.26k | £20.08k | £137.62k | £129.57k | £147.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.73k | £20.07k | £72.42k | £85.29k | £191.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.24k | £750 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 05 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 25 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 05 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 05 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 25TH MARCH 1964
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF A SWIMMING POOL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WOBURN IN THE COUNTY OF BEDFORD.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WOBURN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Crawley Road
Woburn
MK17 9QG
- Phone:
- 01525290611
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window