Trustees YELDEN VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 300086

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paula Willsmore | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Willsmore Mr | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Ellis | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Cheryl Ellis | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Parnham | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Parnham | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Anne Fitzsimmons | Trustee | 15 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Saunders | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN NURSAW-SMITH | Trustee | 26 November 2015 |
|
|||||
ANN FRANKLIN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.