WEST HENDRED VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 300095
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Village Hall is for the use of inhabitants of West Hendred and neighbourhood without distinction of sex or of political religeous or other opinions and in particular for use for meetings lectures and classes and for other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation with the object of improving conditions of life for the said inhabitants

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2020

Total income: £18,698
Total expenditure: £7,114

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 June 1962: Standard registration
  • 28 March 2022: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 28 March 2022: Funds transferred to 1192220 THE WEST HENDRED VILLAGE HALL
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £12.38k £27.34k £8.16k £11.98k £18.70k
Total expenditure £11.79k £35.00k £11.52k £7.97k £7.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £240 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £10.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2020 25 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 03 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 25 June 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required