HANNEY WAR MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Managing the village hall for the benefit of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,886 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 25 March 1969: Standard registration
- HANNEY VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Garner | Chair | 08 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Garth John Dennill | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marcia Graham | Trustee | 19 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kathy Jean Ethelston | Trustee | 19 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Jane Brettell | Trustee | 19 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Neil Donovan | Trustee | 17 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Brettell | Trustee | 08 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Bill Orson | Trustee | 08 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jim Stagg | Trustee | 08 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL WINSTON KILBEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.73k | £25.28k | £23.62k | £21.95k | £37.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.27k | £15.74k | £21.75k | £24.13k | £38.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £22.29k | £12.67k | N/A | £6.89k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
EXTRACTS FROM MINUTE BOOK 1946-1959. TRUST DEED 14TH AUGUST 1969
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL FOR USE OF INHABITANTS OF THE BENEFICIAL AREA.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF EAST AND WEST HANNEY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hanney War Memorial Hall
Brookside
East Hanney
WANTAGE
Oxfordshire
OX12 0JL
- Phone:
- 07970503931
- Email:
- hwmh.hanney@gmail.com
- Website:
-
hwmh.thehanneys.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window