BERKSHIRE ASSOCIATION OF BOYS CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides support - financial and advisory - to the members and leaders of youth groups throughout Berkshire. Provides activity for young people to participate in. Provides training for senior members and leaders as appropriate or need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bracknell Forest
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 22 November 1966: Standard registration
- 31 October 2018: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 31 October 2018: Funds transferred to 1106341 Berkshire Youth LTD
- BABC (Working name)
- BERKSHIRE COUNCIL OF BOYS' CLUBS (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.43k | £4.06k | £4.04k | £4.41k | £4.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.49k | £1.45k | £9.14k | £26.46k | £16.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 25 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 11 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 29 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED JULY 1960 AS AMENDED 4TH NOVEMBER 1971, AND 1ST JUNE 1987
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND EDUCATE BOYS THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUAL MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND, THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF BOYS CLUB (INCLUDING OLD BOYS CLUBS) THROUGHOUT THE COUNTY OF BERKSHIRE.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF BERKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window