ALDERMASTON PARISH HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parish Hall available for hire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,764 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 27 June 1962: Standard registration
- PARISH HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANGELA BOOTT | Chair | 31 October 2012 |
|
|||||
Kim Antell | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clive Vare | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amelia Keightley | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Victoria Robertshaw | Trustee | 26 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Angela Woodley | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karen Dignan | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN TOMLINS | Trustee | 21 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
CATHY JONES | Trustee | 01 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
KERRY THOMAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.57k | £21.56k | £4.99k | £12.12k | £12.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.21k | £10.23k | £24.25k | £16.89k | £17.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.37k | £12.83k | N/A | N/A | £1.76k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 November 2020 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 14 AUGUST 1948
Charitable objects
PARISH HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ALDERMASTON AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Aldermaston Parish Hall
The Street
Aldermaston
READING
RG7 4LW
- Phone:
- 07748791544
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window