BUCKLEBURY MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Manages a Village Hall for the purpose of the communities within the parish of Bucklebury. The Hall is available for hire to both individuals and group activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 01 January 1963: Standard registration
- BUCKLEBURY MEMORIAL HALL (Working name)
- BUCKLEBURY VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN HICKS | Chair | 17 January 2014 |
|
|||||
Sandra Elizabeth Nicholls | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alison Claire Brownfield | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Rose Goode | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Stokes | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Lucy Thurgut | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael William Musgrave Morgan | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL CLIFFORD FORMAN BODSWORTH | Trustee | 16 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
JULIA ANN BAKER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.38k | £20.28k | £20.38k | £25.00k | £23.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.86k | £8.76k | £17.29k | £25.14k | £26.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 March 2024 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 02 OCT 1950 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 09 DEC 1997 AS AMENDED ON 11 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELD.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BUCKLEBURY AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
LITTLE ACRES
THE SLADE
BUCKLEBURY
READING
RG7 6TE
- Phone:
- 01635864310
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window