Trustees ACLAND MEMORIAL HALL
Charity number: 300137

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD HANKS | Chair | 18 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Jardine | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jarrod Bryan James PRICE | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caitlin Dalgleish | Trustee | 18 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Harrison | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jackie Roberts | Trustee | 09 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Silsby | Trustee | 16 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL QUARTLEY | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Judy Connolly | Trustee | 05 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Roberts | Trustee | 20 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
JUNE HEATON | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Avens | Trustee | 30 July 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.