EAST CHALLOW VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hire and upkeep of East Challow village hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
Total income includes £4,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 20 October 1970: Standard registration
- EAST CHALLOW VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Ruth Caplen | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Charles Crump | Trustee | 27 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Naomi Ruth Merritt | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Vanessa Anne Bosley | Trustee | 19 June 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.31k | £10.19k | £20.08k | £13.68k | £19.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.20k | £8.72k | £11.38k | £12.16k | £12.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £8.61k | £13.76k | £450 | £4.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 25 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 11 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST 22 JUNE 1970
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF EAST CHALLOW
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
Main Street
East Challow
WANTAGE
Oxfordshire
OX12 9SR
- Phone:
- 07827 042978
- Email:
- bookings.ecvh@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window