FARMOOR VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide & maintain the Village Hall Facilities so that Residents may have a pleasant environment for their various activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £900 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 27 June 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pam Mason | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Jones | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jayne Samsworth | Trustee | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Healy | Trustee | 25 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Swift | Trustee | 15 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
HARVEY ADAM SWIFT | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.91k | £3.49k | £8.95k | £12.92k | £12.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.39k | £4.46k | £10.26k | £10.07k | £12.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £900 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 22 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 02 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25TH AUGUST 1961 as amended on 19 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INBABITANTS OF FARMOOR AND THE NEIHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
FARMOOR AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Farmoor Village Hall
Cumnor Road
Farmoor
OXFORD
OX2 9NS
- Phone:
- 01865865843
- Email:
- farmoorvillagehall@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window