FINCHAMPSTEAD PARK

Charity number: 300152
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

provides buildings & open space for recreational and sports purposes for parishioners & people who live in the locaility

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £36,636
Total expenditure: £57,043

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Wokingham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 June 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NEIL DOODY Chair
None on record
Gary Edward Loveday Trustee 30 April 2018
None on record
STEPHEN PETER BROMLEY Trustee 30 April 2017
FINCHAMPSTEAD AND BARKHAM RELIEF IN SICKNESS FUND
Received: On time
Simon Philip Weeks Trustee 30 April 2015
None on record
Edwina Jane Kilsby Trustee 30 April 2015
None on record
ROLAND HENRY CUNDY Trustee 30 April 2008
FINCHAMPSTEAD AND BARKHAM RELIEF IN SICKNESS FUND
Received: On time
BINFIELD WELFARE CHARITIES
Received: On time
LEARNING TO WORK (SOUTH EAST) LIMITED
Received: On time
CALIFORNIA ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
SUSAN NAPPER Trustee
None on record
BEVERLEY KEMP Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £36.17k £29.35k £47.13k £37.79k £36.64k
Total expenditure £29.08k £18.85k £45.21k £28.73k £57.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £2.67k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £16.91k £2.67k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 13 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 13 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 06 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 06 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 19 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 19 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Memorial Hall
The Village
Finchampstead
WOKINGHAM
Berkshire
RG40 4JU
Phone:
01189731833
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available