Trustees KENNINGTON VILLAGE HALL CHARITY
Charity number: 300170

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Katherine Marsden | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Delia Grant | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Brown | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Whelan-Matthews | Trustee | 04 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Keith Sherman | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alan Cobb | Trustee | 02 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
LINDA FRANKUM | Trustee | 02 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DENISE CATTELL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.