Financial history SHAW-CUM-DONNINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 300200
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.77k £19.65k £23.44k £17.18k £36.23k
Total expenditure £16.21k £13.30k £12.00k £35.03k £31.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.10k £11.99k £850 £16.16k