MORTIMER (ST JOHN'S) VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Managing and maintaining Mortimer Village Hall
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 04 June 1962: Standard registration
- ST JOHNS VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Paul Bilbe | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Rob Wilderspin | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Pocock | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anna Horwood | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Shaw | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brian Thatcher | Trustee | 30 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Hudson | Trustee | 22 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Helen Burt | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.50k | £21.53k | £29.51k | £17.25k | £21.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.59k | £11.51k | £23.75k | £15.60k | £18.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £16.91k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 April 2023 | 171 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 October 2021 | 359 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27TH MARCH 1962, AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 9/2/93.
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF STRATFIELD MORTIMER AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Johns Village Hall
22 West End Road
Mortimer Common
READING
RG7 3TF
- Phone:
- 07752427027
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window