MEMORIAL HALL AND PLAYING FIELDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide recreational space for residents of West Berkshire and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 01 January 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SANDRA BAILEY | Chair | 17 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Janet Cover | Trustee | 06 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Allison Pritchard | Trustee | 31 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Michael Famer | Trustee | 31 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michael Jon de Courcy Cole | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|||||
NATHAN GREGORY | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|||||
NICK CORNISH | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philip Dewsbury | Trustee | 02 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.94k | £74.75k | £67.93k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.09k | £62.69k | £70.87k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 293 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 293 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 09 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 09 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 29 DECEMBER 1981 as amended on 07 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELDS
Area of benefit
PARISH OF THATCHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
THATCHAM MEMORIAL HALL
BATH ROAD
THATCHAM
RG18 3AG
- Phone:
- 01635868244
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window