AMERSHAM AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ASSOCIATION LETS OUT ITS ROOMS TO CLUBS, SOCIETIES, CHARITIES AND MANY OTHER USERS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 24 March 1964: Standard registration
- AMERSHAM AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Oxley | Chair | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lionel David Avery | Trustee | 29 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Matza | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ann Beattie | Trustee | 17 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Gill Morgan | Trustee | 08 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Clark | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Carol Louise Henry | Trustee | 01 May 2010 |
|
|
||||
MRS JEAN BOWLING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JEAN ANDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £105.52k | £105.25k | £92.15k | £109.37k | £155.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.79k | £75.89k | £99.35k | £125.02k | £144.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2024 | 317 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2024 | 317 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 July 2023 | 177 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 July 2023 | 177 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 October 2022 | 270 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 October 2022 | 270 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5TH APRIL 1951.AGREEMENT DATED 29TH NOVEMBER 1956, REVISED OCTOBER 1998
Charitable objects
COMMUNITY CENTRE
Area of benefit
AMERSHAM AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
AMERSHAM COMMUNITY CENTRE
CHILTERN AVENUE
AMERSHAM
HP6 5AH
- Phone:
- 01494433436
- Email:
- angela_bates@btconnect.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window