CHALFONT ST PETER YOUTH CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a community youth centre run by local volunteers for school years 7-11. We provide a safe environment for young people to meet, where they can enjoy a range of open and structured youth activities.We are the only independent youth centre in Chalfont St Peter whose youth work is delivered solely by volunteers. We totally embrace and are committed to the philosophy of "Every Child Matters".
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
68 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 12 February 1963: Standard registration
- 02 February 2022: Funds received from 300265 UNDER TWENTIES CLUB
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES EDWARD SIMMONS | Chair | 27 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Jenny Michelle Le Grys | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Bramwell Morris | Trustee | 25 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN PICKARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AVTAR SINGH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.89k | £38.89k | £45.20k | £35.92k | £52.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.31k | £18.44k | £35.24k | £55.66k | £39.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.15k | £21.10k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED (INCLUDING CONSTITUTION) DATED 12TH JANUARY 1945 AND CONVEYANCE DATED 13TH FEBRUARY 1945 AS AMENDED 27TH SEPTEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
YOUTH CENTRE.
Area of benefit
THE DISTRICTS OF CHALFONT ST. PETER AND GERRARDS CROSS
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHALFONT ST. PETER YOUTH CENTRE
TITHE BARN
SANDY RISE
CHALFONT ST. PETER
GERRARDS CROSS
SL9 9TR
- Phone:
- 01753 883712
- Email:
- office@cspyouthcentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window