COLESHILL VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 300250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Operation and management of village hall

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £32,279
Total expenditure: £35,947

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 June 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nigel Woof Chair 22 May 2024
SLOUGH REFUGEE SUPPORT
Received: On time
Nigel Keith Wolfendale Trustee 02 May 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £28.45k £21.35k £16.49k £24.14k £32.28k
Total expenditure £28.17k £17.65k £16.72k £24.54k £35.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 14 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 14 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Potters Meadow
Village Road
Coleshill
AMERSHAM
HP7 0LR
Phone:
01494723092