Eton Wick Village Hall

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Part of the Ground Floor was leased to the local authority providing the village with a library. The library is closed at the moment. The remaining Ground Floor area is leased to a Children's Nursery . The First Floor comprises a large hall, smaller meeting room and kitchen. These rooms are hired by the local community for various meetings, groups, classes, family parties and community events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 17 October 1962: Standard registration
- ETON WICK VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- ETON WICK AND BOVENEY VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- ETON WICK AND BOVENEY VILLAGE HALL AND VAUGHAN CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lindsay Jane Pardoe | Chair | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Clare Belchamber | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Welford | Trustee | 05 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Murphy | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Cooney | Trustee | 08 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Russell Anthony Wernham | Trustee | 13 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ann Catherine Lovell | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Emily Patel | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Pausey | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Riccardo Armando Ludovici | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Abigail Ludovici | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Clara May Stevenson | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Karen Ann McGlasson | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MICHAEL LOVELL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.02k | £12.92k | £33.00k | £31.30k | £35.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.40k | £16.25k | £27.00k | £52.00k | £36.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 April 2024 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 April 2024 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE OF 5 MARCH 1934 AND SCHEME OF 22 OCTOBER 1979 as amended on 07 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL AND CLUB
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WICK AND BOVENEY NEW TOWN CONSTITUTE 05.03.1934
Contact information
- Address:
-
Eton Wick Village Hall
1 Eton Wick Road
Eton Wick
WINDSOR
Berkshire
SL4 6LT
- Phone:
- 07949 147846
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window