LAVENDON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lavendon Village Hall is the focal point for many of the village activities. It is the meeting venue for the youth club, the old peoples welfare association, short mat bowls club, weekly whist drives and other private and fund raising activities. The trustees are totally responsible for the upkeep of the building and for maintaining financial viability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 30 August 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bev Shaw | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY SIMMONDS | Trustee | 19 March 2014 |
|
|||||
Nigel Brian Stickells | Trustee | 03 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
John Salter | Trustee | 03 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.53k | £3.76k | £18.80k | £50.96k | £21.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.09k | £17.20k | £12.52k | £41.10k | £34.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | £2.67k | £25.04k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 07 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 09/11/1953 AS AMENDED ON 16/09/2013 AS AMENDED ON 17/02/2014 as amended on 15 Apr 2024
Charitable objects
TO ERECT AND MAINTAIN A VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LAVENDON AND IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Contact information
- Address:
-
1-3 Northampton Road
Lavendon
OLNEY
MK46 4EY
- Phone:
- 01234711314
- Email:
- simmondsgeoffrey@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window