THE MEMORIAL HALL, LOUGHTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the benefit of the Village people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 25 May 1971: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roger Wood | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alison Denise Farrar-Wood | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Estelle Watson | Trustee | 17 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY HELEN PARRY ROWCROFT JAMES | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|||||
John Walter Rowcroft-James | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.97k | £22.05k | £3.99k | £2.81k | £4.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.81k | £3.67k | £4.78k | £6.74k | £9.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 April 2024 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 March 2022 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE, 25TH JUNE 1926
Charitable objects
FOR USE AS A READING ROOM FOR THE USE OF PERSONS OF EITHER SEX OF THE AGE OF FIFTEEN YEARS UPWARDS, AND FOR LECTURES, ENTERTAINMENTS AND MEETINGS FOR THE SOCIAL AND INTELLECTUAL WELFARE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE INHABITANTS ALSO OTHERWISE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LOUGHTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Loughton Memorial Hall
44 Bradwell Road
Loughton
MILTON KEYNES
MK5 8AJ
- Phone:
- 01908395870
- Email:
- lmh@loughtonmemorialhall.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window