MARSH GIBBON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of village hall premises for hire by the residents and organisations of Marsh Gibbon and surrounding area. The hall is used for many different types of activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 30 July 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
June Smith | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Barry Leonard | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard William Cross | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Jane Heath | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Robert Phipps Berry | Trustee | 26 August 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.36k | £40.08k | £77.51k | £121.69k | £85.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.27k | £27.68k | £49.72k | £61.89k | £91.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.67k | £8.00k | £46.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 10TH FEBRUARY 1964 as amended on 03 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MARSH GIBBON AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Moat View
West Edge
Marsh Gibbon
BICESTER
Oxfordshire
OX27 0HA
- Phone:
- 07974961437
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window