NAPHILL VILLAGE HALL AND PLAYING FIELDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide, maintain and manage a village hall and playing fields for use by the local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 06 December 1962: Standard registration
- NAPHILL VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- NAPHILL VILLAGE HALLAND PLAYING FIELDS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIVE LAWRENCE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rob McMurray | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jason Fletcher | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
DAVID EVANS | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bartha Elizabeth Pitman | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Tench | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
DARREN LOMAS | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Keattch | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Williams | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Linda Clark | Trustee | 04 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
TANYA STEVENS | Trustee | 06 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAUL RIGLAR | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gloria Mildred Leflaive | Trustee | 09 April 2002 |
|
|
||||
SARAH BACON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR ANDREW WASILEWSKI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CATHRYN CARTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.30k | £31.58k | £27.40k | £56.06k | £151.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.40k | £28.29k | £20.27k | £64.34k | £77.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.73k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 09 APR 2002 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 04 APR 2016
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE INHABITANTS OF HUGHENDON PARISH.
Area of benefit
THE VILLAGE OF NAPHILL IN THE PARISH OF HUGHENDEN IN THE COUNTY OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY (THIS MEANS THE ELECTORAL DIVISION OF NAPHILL WHICH INCLUDES WALTERS ASH
Linked charities
- 06 December 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Village Hall
Main Road
Naphill
HIGH WYCOMBE
HP14 4SX
- Phone:
- 01494562742
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window