THE STOKE GOLDINGTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a Village Hall for the use of Village Residents and external hirers; for example, PreSchool Group, Youth Club, various recreational clubs. In addition, events for residents of the village and private functions. Fundraising activities to support the maintenance and running of the Village Hall include a Summer Fair.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 08 September 1971: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR DAVE CHISHOLM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Jennifer Dudman | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gillian May Sapwell | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Allen | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roy Baker | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Baker | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tanya Potts | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mike Dancy | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Wonham Rutherford | Trustee | 11 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET CHISHOLM | Trustee | 22 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.27k | £16.95k | £18.05k | £24.94k | £23.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.45k | £22.06k | £18.02k | £22.08k | £21.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 02 APR 1971 AS AMENDED ON 01 JAN 1993 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 20 NOV 2003 AS AMENDED ON 13 OCT 2017 AS AMENDED ON 22 SEP 2021
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF STOKE GOLDINGTON AND GAYHURST
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 High Street
Stoke Goldington
NEWPORT PAGNELL
MK16 8NR
- Phone:
- 07763512377
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window