WADDESDON HALL

Charity Number: 300343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Management of a village hall for the use of the inhabitants of Waddesdon and the surrounding neighbourhood.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £144,231
Total expenditure: £135,267

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 May 1968: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • WADDESDON VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Margaret Prova O'Sullivan Trustee 14 August 2024
None on record
Christopher Swatton Trustee 19 September 2023
None on record
John Wilson Trustee 19 September 2023
None on record
Anne Philippa Shirley Trustee 19 September 2023
None on record
S.J.P. TRUST CORPORATION LIMITED Trustee 02 June 2017
LOUISA COTTAGES CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £78.94k £70.23k £50.76k £99.57k £144.23k
Total expenditure £104.98k £75.66k £58.83k £102.28k £135.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £37.90k £40.49k £16.26k £5.95k £11.99k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 20 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 20 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 03 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 13 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
C/O J ROTHSCHILD SERVICES LIMITED
Estate Office
Queen Street
WADDESDON
AYLESBURY
HP18 0JW
Phone:
01296653410
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available