Financial history CAMBRIDGE UNIT 66 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 300372
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.82k £29.94k £17.23k £6.44k £6.50k
Total expenditure £9.78k £6.95k £7.48k £10.99k £9.68k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £20.71k £8.00k N/A N/A